Reports for Jordi Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jordi Holding AG
- Jordi Holding AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of other financial institutions». The legal headquarters are in Bern.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 21.09.2012.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 08.08.2017. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company Jordi Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-187.128.513.
- Next to the company Jordi Holding AG there are 9 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Aegertenhof AG, Immobiliengesellschaft Sprünglistrasse AG, Jordi + Partner AG dipl. Architekten ETH/SIA.
Management (3)
newest board members
Matthias Wenger,
Roland Marcus Jordi,
Stefanie Sara Wenger-Jordi
newest authorized signatories
Matthias Wenger,
Roland Marcus Jordi,
Stefanie Sara Wenger-Jordi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.09.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.055.045-2
UID/VAT
CHE-187.128.513
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, den Verkauf und das Halten von Beteiligungen an Immobilien-, Generalunternehmungs- und Beratungsgesellschaften. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen oder Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jordi Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3684623, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jordi Holding AG, in Bern, CHE-187.128.513, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 23.10.2013, Publ. 1141699).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wenger-Jordi, Stefanie, von Bern, Bolligen, Uetendorf und Wyssachen, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Jordi, Roland, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wenger, Matthias, von Bolligen und Uetendorf, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1141699, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jordi Holding AG, in Bern, CH-036.3.055.045-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 26.09.2012, Publ. 6864328).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jordi Schumacher, Nadine, von Bern, Wyssachen und Sennwald, in Bern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wenger-Jordi, Stefanie, von Bern, Wyssachen, Bolligen und Uetendorf, in Bern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 6864328, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jordi Holding AG, in Bern, CH-036.3.055.045-2, Mülinenstrasse 23, 3006 Bern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
19.09.2012.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, den Verkauf und das Halten von Beteiligungen an Immobilien-, Generalunternehmungs- und Beratungsgesellschaften. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen oder Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre:
schriftlich oder mit elektronischer Post.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 19.09.2012 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Wenger-Jordi, Stefanie, von Bern, Wyssachen, Bolligen und Uetendorf, in Bern, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Jordi Schumacher, Nadine, von Bern, Wyssachen und Sennwald, in Bern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.