Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Lenzlinger Advokatur
Alpenstrasse 12
6304 Zug
Branches (1)
Reports for JML AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.11.1986
Deletion from the commercial register
07.08.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.019.620-3
UID/VAT
CHE-106.013.881
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vermittlung von Versicherungsverträgen, Vertrieb und Plazierung von Finanzprogrammen, insbesondere Anlagen in Gold und anderen Edelmetallen, Erbringung von Dienstleistungen auf dem Finanzsektor, Beratung in finanziellen Belangen, Entwicklung und Durchführung von Werbe- und Marketingstrategien sowie Vermittlungsgeschäfte; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 01.11.2007 | 06.08.2015 | |
Bachmann Treuhand AG | Zürich | 31.07.2006 | 31.10.2007 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | <2004 | 30.07.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- JML AG
- JML Jürg M. Lattmann AG
- JML Lattmann Jürg M. AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: JML AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2310929, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
JML AG in Liquidation, in Zug, CHE-106.013.881, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 24.12.2013, Publ. 1255541). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 1255541, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
JML AG, in Zug, CHE-106.013.881, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 05.04.2012, Publ. 6627112).
Firma neu:
JML AG in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
c/o Lenzlinger Advokatur, Alpenstrasse 12, 6304 Zug.
Aktien neu:
1'300 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00. [bisher: 1300 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1000.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 05.11.2013 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hamel, Gerhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Göfis (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sager, Dr. Christian, von Emmen und Zollikon, in Wald ZH, Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dornbierer, Harald, von Thal, in Staad SG , Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Direktor mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6627112, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
JML AG, in Zug, CH-170.3.019.620-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 27.08.2010, S. 19, Publ. 5787352).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bock, Dr. Thomas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Götzis (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hamel, Gerhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Göfis (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.