Address
c/o Patrick Jenzer
Rebmatt 34
4316 Hellikon
Reports for Jenzer Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jenzer Holding AG
- Jenzer Holding AG in Hellikon is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of investment companies». Jenzer Holding AG is active.
- The company was founded on 22.12.2016.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 11.02.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-154.654.829.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.12.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hellikon
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.442.103-1
UID/VAT
CHE-154.654.829
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen und zentrale Führung der Geschäftsaktivitäten ihrer Tochtergesellschaften, zentrale und koordinierte Finanzierung derselben sowie Verwaltung von Immobilien und Finanzvermögen im In- und Ausland; kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und verkaufen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jenzer Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005403788, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Jenzer Holding AG, in Hellikon, CHE-154.654.829, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 28.12.2016, Publ. 3252025).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mösch, Arthur, von Gipf-Oberfrick, in Wegenstetten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mösch, Adrian, von Gipf-Oberfrick, in Wegenstetten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jenzer, Patrick, von Mumpf, in Hellikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Waldmeier-Jenzer, Sibylle, von Hellikon, in Hellikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3252025, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Jenzer Holding AG, in Hellikon, CHE-154.654.829, c/o Patrick Jenzer, Rebmatt 34, 4316 Hellikon, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
21.12.2016.
Zweck:
Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen und zentrale Führung der Geschäftsaktivitäten ihrer Tochtergesellschaften, zentrale und koordinierte Finanzierung derselben sowie Verwaltung von Immobilien und Finanzvermögen im In- und Ausland;
kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und verkaufen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 300'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 300'000.00.
Aktien:
300 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 21.12.2016 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Mösch, Arthur, von Gipf-Oberfrick, in Wegenstetten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jenzer, Patrick, von Mumpf, in Hellikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mösch, Adrian, von Gipf-Oberfrick, in Wegenstetten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.