Reports for J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG
- J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG has its legal headquarters in Glattbrugg, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in clothings».
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 21.12.2009.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 10.10.2022. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-115.303.757.
- On the same address as J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG there are 22 other active companies registered. These include: Al dente Gastro AG, Binz Textil AG, CAMA Fashionpartners GmbH.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Guillaume Henryk Wacker,
Hans Christian Meyer,
Florian Johannes Gross,
Mario Messerli
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.12.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.034.622-7
UID/VAT
CHE-115.303.757
Sector
Trading in clothings
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Handel mit Textilien und Kleidern. Weiter kann sie immaterielle Güter, im Speziellen Lizenzen, kaufen, verkaufen und vertreiben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften in der Schweiz und im Ausland gründen. Sie kann Beteiligungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland an anderen Unternehmen halten. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, alle Geschäfte durchzuführen, welche mit diesem Geschäftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Immobilien in der Schweiz und im Ausland erwerben, verpfänden und verkaufen. Sie kann Darlehen gewähren, Garantien und Sicherheiten für Tochtergesellschaften und Drittparteien bereitstellen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005578927, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG, in Opfikon, CHE-115.303.757, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2020, Publ. 1005057210).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Odland, Joel Klas Richard, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stockholm (SE), mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wacker, Guillaume Henryk, von Genève, in Lidingö (SE), mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1005057210, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG, in Opfikon, CHE-115.303.757, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 13.01.2020, Publ. 1004802085).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Andersson, Bons Per Jonas, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stockholm (SE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Hans Christian, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bromma (SE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004802085, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
J.Lindeberg Schweiz AG, in Opfikon, CHE-115.303.757, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 29.03.2019, Publ. 1004598562).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Johansson, Daniel Bo Kenneth, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Järfälla (SE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Mark, Johan, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stockholm (SE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Andersson, Bons Per Jonas, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stockholm (SE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Odland, Joel Klas Richard, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stockholm (SE), mit Einzelprokura.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.