Address
c/o Isotech Biel-Seeland AG Studen
Wydengasse 4
2557 Studen BE
Reports for Isotech Group Genossenschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Isotech Group Genossenschaft
- Isotech Group Genossenschaft with its legal headquarters in Studen BE is a Cooperative from the sector «Services regarding management consulting». Isotech Group Genossenschaft is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The organization was founded on 03.10.2000.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 08.10.2021.
- The organization Isotech Group Genossenschaft is registered under the UID CHE-101.105.688.
- On the same address as Isotech Group Genossenschaft there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Isotech Biel-Seeland AG Studen, Seal Construction GmbH, Spenglerei Paul Frei AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.10.2000
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Studen (BE)
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-400.5.021.812-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.105.688
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Genossenschaft ist die Wahrung und Förderung der gemeinsamen Berufsinteressen ihrer Mitglieder durch Zusammenarbeit, insbesondere auf den Gebieten des gemeinsamen Marktauftritts (Werbung, Internetauftritt und Schutz und Gebrauch der Wort- und Bildmarke (Logo) Isotech etc.), des Einkaufs, der Qualitätsförderung und -sicherung, der Aus- und Fortbildung, der Betriebsberatung und des Informationsaustausches sowie die Schaffung einer Schieds- und Schlichtungsstelle. Die Genossenschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, Immobilien und Grundstücke erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Genossenschaft kann Marken und Lizenzen erwerben und veräussern. Die Genossenschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Genossenschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Isotech Group
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Isotech Group Genossenschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005308137, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Isotech Group Genossenschaft, in Studen (BE), CHE-101.105.688, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 21.06.2017, Publ. 3592611).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mathys, Andreas Rudolf, von Rohrbachgraben, in Schmitten FR, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Albrecht, Paul, von Zürich, in Geroldswil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyrsch, Lukas, von Buochs, in Stans, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Safrany, Andy, von Möhlin, in Würenlos, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3592611, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Isotech Group Genossenschaft, in Studen (BE), CHE-101.105.688, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 27.08.2010, Publ. 5787792).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aeschbacher, Alfred, von Eggiwil, in Worben, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Felder, Herbert, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Steinhausen, Mitglied, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aeschbacher, Yves, von Eggiwil, in Gerolfingen (Täuffelen), Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Albrecht, Paul, von Zürich, in Geroldswil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5787922, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Isotech Group, in Aarau, CH-400.5.021.812-2, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2004, S. 2, Publ. 2605750). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Studen BE im Handelsregister des Kantons Aargau von Amtes wegen gelöscht. Gesellschaft am neuen Sitz Isotech Group Genossenschaft.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.