About Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft
- Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft has its legal headquarters in Vaduz, is active and operates in the sector «Fiduciary services».
- The company was founded on 22.08.1997 and has one person in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 26.05.2022.
- Companies with the same address as Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft: ARATEO ANSTALT, BIOREMA INTERNATIONAL AG, ContinereX Aktiengesellschaft.
Commercial register information
Legal headquarters of the company
Vaduz
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language)
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist: , a) Übernahme von Treuhänderschaften; , b) Gründung von Verbandspersonen und Gesellschaften für Dritte, in deren Namen oder im eigenen Namen und für fremde Rechnung, und damit verbundene Interventionen bei Behörden und Amtsstellen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft_
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5030/2022, (1)
Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft, in Vaduz, FL-0001.538.369-9, Aktiengesellschaft.
Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Pro Finance International Trust & Consulting AG, 9490 Vaduz, Revisionsstelle.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
BDO (Liechtenstein) AG, 9490 Vaduz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 20232542, (1)
eAmtsblatt, 25.12.2017 Handelsregister, Änderung, 25.12.2017 Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft, Vaduz (FL-0001.538.369-9) Jahresrechnung eingereicht
Publication number: 20220792, (1)
Handelsregister 19.01.2017, Internationale Trust Aktiengesellschaft, Vaduz (FL-0001.538.369-9) Aktiengesellschaft Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend: Kaiser, lic.iur.HSG Nicole Maria, StA: Liechtenstein, 9491 Ruggell, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.