Address
Untere Paulistrasse 6b
8834 Schindellegi
Reports for intermaps AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout intermaps AG
- intermaps AG has its legal headquarters in Schindellegi and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Services regarding public relations».
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 27.01.2009.
- In the commercial register the company intermaps AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.145.529.
- On the same address there are 7 other active companies registered. These include: Burckhardt's Corporate Events AG, Gemini Consulting AG, Nöni Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.10.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Feusisberg
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.011.613-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.145.529
Sector
Services regarding public relations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung und Produktion von Lösungen für Medien; kann alle Vorkehrungen treffen, die für die Entwicklung und Produktion von solchen Lösungen nötig sind, insbesondere Erwerb und Verwaltung von Marken und Patenten; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Artho Consulting & Controlling | Zürich | <2004 | 26.01.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- intermaps Ltd
- intermaps SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: intermaps AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4846904, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
intermaps AG, in Feusisberg, CH-130.0.011.613-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2007, S. 11, Publ. 3893980).
Statutenänderung:
3.12.2008. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre durch Brief . [Weitere Statutenänderungen sind nicht publikationspflichtig.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 3.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Artho Consulting & Controlling, von St. Gallenkappel, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vonach, Christian, von Oesterreich, in Schindellegi, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied];
Zitt, Claudia, von Österreich, in Wien (AT), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3893980, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
intermaps AG, bisher in Freienbach, CH-130.0.011.613-6, Entwicklung und Produktion von Lösungen für Medien, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 01.04.2005, S. 12, Publ. 2771666).
Statutenänderung:
3.04.2007.
Sitz neu:
Feusisberg.
Domizil neu:
Untere Paulistrasse 6b, 8834 Schindellegi.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vonach, Christian, von Oesterreich, in Schindellegi, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Lachen SZ].
Publication number: 2771666, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
intermaps AG, in Freienbach, CH-130.0.011.613-6, Entwicklung und Produktion von Lösungen für Medien, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 25.02.2005, S. 13, Publ. 2717840). [gestrichen: Die Gesellschaft ist derzeit ohne genügende Vertretung.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vonach, Christian, von Oesterreich, in Lachen SZ, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Namborn (D), Präsident].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.