Reports for Inter CosMedic GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inter CosMedic GmbH
- Inter CosMedic GmbH is active in the industry «Research and development» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Gisikon.
- The company was founded on 30.04.2018 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 24.11.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company Inter CosMedic GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-219.086.513.
- The address is identical with 8 other active companies. These include: Easy Komm AG, EM Science GmbH, Inter Science GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.04.2018
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Gisikon
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.805.532-7
UID/VAT
CHE-219.086.513
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Forschung und Entwicklung im Bereich Medizintechnik; Erwerb, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Wertschriften; Erwerb und Veräusserung von anderen Unternehmen; Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Unternehmensanteilen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum; Vornahme von Finanzierungen sowie Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte; Die Gesellschaft kann ihren direkten oder indirekten Stammanteilsinhabern oder anderen Gesellschaften des Inter Science-Konzerns Darlehen gewähren und für deren Verbindlichkeiten gegenüber Dritten Sicherheiten aller Art bestellen, einschliesslich mittels Verpfändung oder Sicherungsübereignung eigener Aktiven oder Garantien jeglicher Art, auch wenn diese Darlehen oder Sicherheiten im ausschliesslichen Interesse ihrer direkten oder indirekten Gesellschafter oder anderer Konzerngesellschaften liegen und unentgeltlich gewährt werden.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inter CosMedic GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005341104, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Inter CosMedic GmbH, in Gisikon, CHE-219.086.513, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 23.05.2019, Publ. 1004636546).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Medana Medical Group Korlátolt Felelosségu Társaság (Cg.01-09-305366), in Budapest (HU), Gesellschafterin, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Inter-Scientific GmbH (CHE-159.105.760), in Gisikon, Gesellschafterin, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Bieri, Roland, von Luzern, in Takiantia (TH), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Gisikon].
Publication number: HR02-1004636546, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Inter CosMedic GmbH, in Gisikon, CHE-219.086.513, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 16.05.2019, Publ. 1004631261).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fässler, Josef, von Unteriberg, in Wädenswil, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004631261, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Inter CosMedic GmbH, in Gisikon, CHE-219.086.513, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 03.05.2018, Publ. 4209513).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Günther, Enric Robert, von Leukerbad, in Hattersheim (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bieri, Roland, von Luzern, in Gisikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.