Reports for INKVADERS SàRL
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout INKVADERS SàRL
- INKVADERS SàRL has its legal headquarters in St-Séverin and is active. It operates in the sector «Performance of various services».
- INKVADERS SàRL was founded on 28.09.2017.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 09.01.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-246.904.692.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.09.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Conthey
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-660.2.819.017-3
UID/VAT
CHE-246.904.692
Sector
Performance of various services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un studio de tatouages et vente de vêtements et accessoires (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: INKVADERS SàRL
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005929715, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
INKVADERS SàRL, à Conthey, CHE-246.904.692, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 243 du 14.12.2018, Publ. 1004521789).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Sereni, Emilie, ressortissante française, à Veyrier, associée, sans droit de signature, pour 30 parts sociales de CHF 200.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Nguyen, Van-Kim Christian, de Lancy, à Veyrier, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 200.00 [précédemment: pour 70 parts sociales de CHF 200.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004521789, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
INKVADERS SàRL, précédemment à Carouge (GE), CHE-246.904.692, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 191 du 03.10.2017).
Modification des statuts:
05.12.2018.
Nouveau siège:
Conthey.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Savoie 160, 1975 St-Séverin.
Publication number: HR02-1004521838, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
INKVADERS SàRL, à Carouge (GE), CHE-246.904.692 (FOSC du 03.10.2017, p. 0/3786749). Par suite du transfert de son siège à Conthey, la société est inscrite au registre du commerce du Valais central;
par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du registre de Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.