Reports for In Invest Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout In Invest Holding SA
- In Invest Holding SA from Crissier operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions» and is active.
- The company was founded on 05.01.2018 and has one person in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 09.07.2020.
- In the commercial register the company In Invest Holding SA is registered under the UID CHE-481.201.998.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.01.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Crissier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.018.450-6
UID/VAT
CHE-481.201.998
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la prise et la gestion de participations dans toutes entreprises commerciales, industrielles, financières en Suisse et à l'étranger, l'octroi aux entreprises auxquelles elle s'intéresse, notamment à ses filiales, de tous prêts, avances ou garanties ainsi que l'acquisition, la gestion et la mise en valeur de marques, brevets et licence (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: In Invest Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004933571, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
In Invest Holding SA, à Conthey, CHE-481.201.998, société anonyme (No. FOSC 6 du 10.01.2018, Publ. 3980225). Par suite de transfert du siège à Crissier, l'entité juridique est inscrite au registre du canton de Vaud. Par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du Registre du commerce du Valais central.
Publication number: HR02-1004933498, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
In Invest Holding SA, précédemment à Conthey, CHE-481.201.998 (FOSC du 10.01.2018, p. 0/3980225). Siège transféré à Crissier.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin de Pré-Fleuri 4, 1023 Crissier. Statuts modifiés le 22 juin 2020.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but la prise et la gestion de participations dans toutes entreprises commerciales, industrielles, financières en Suisse et à l'étranger, l'octroi aux entreprises auxquelles elle s'intéresse, notamment à ses filiales, de tous prêts, avances ou garanties ainsi que l'acquisition, la gestion et la mise en valeur de marques, brevets et licence (pour but complet cf. statuts). Les 100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000, formant l'entier du capital-actions, sont désormais avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts. Les statuts ne prévoient plus de clause particulière au sujet du mode de communication aux actionnaires.
Publication number: 3980225, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
In Invest Holding SA, à Conthey, CHE-481.201.998, Route du Sécheron 2, 1964 Conthey, société anonyme (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
20.12.2017.
But:
La prise et la gestion de participations dans toutes entreprises commerciales, industrielles, financières en Suisse et à l'étranger, l'octroi aux entreprises auxquelles elle s'intéresse, notamment à ses filiales, de tous prêts, avances ou garanties ainsi que l'acquisition, la gestion et la mise en valeur de marques, brevets et licence.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000.00.
Capital-actions libéré:
CHF 100'000.00.
Actions:
100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par lettre recommandée, par fax, par email ou par avis inséré dans la FOSC.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Pereira da Mota Gaspar, Ricardo Jorge, ressortissant portugais, à Crissier, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 20.12.2017, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.