Reports for IC information company AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout IC information company AG
- IC information company AG with its legal headquarters in Pratteln is active. IC information company AG operates in the sector «IT services».
- IC information company AG was founded on 16.07.2013.
- The last commercial register change was made on 13.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- IC information company AG is registered in the Canton of BL under the UID CHE-426.459.690.
- On the same address as IC information company AG there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: BESTE Holding AG, Fürsorgefonds der Firma Paul Pfirter & Co. AG, Paul Pfirter & Co. AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Konrad Thomas Studerus,
Richard Huber,
Renato Marcelino Josef Heldner
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Konrad Thomas Studerus,
Richard Huber,
Renato Marcelino Josef Heldner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.07.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pratteln
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.017.052-8
UID/VAT
CHE-426.459.690
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Anbieten von Dienstleistungen sowie die Entwicklung, den Vertrieb und den Handel in den Bereichen Informatik, EDV, Hard- und Software. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslands beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Wertschriften, Patente und andere Schutzrechte erwerben oder weiterveräussern, sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRESO Treuhand AG | Olten | 22.06.2021 | 12.12.2022 | |
Copartner Revision AG | Basel | 01.09.2016 | 21.06.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- IC information company Ltd
- IC information company SA
- IC information company holding SA
- IC information company holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: IC information company AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006105528, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
IC information company AG, in Pratteln, CHE-426.459.690, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 01.03.2024, Publ. 1005975056).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fleig, Marco, von Dübendorf, in Oberentfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studerus, Konrad Thomas, von Waldkirch, in Menzingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005975056, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
IC information company AG, in Pratteln, CHE-426.459.690, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 14.04.2023, Publ. 1005724023).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eppenberger, Stephan, von Neckertal, in Untersiggenthal, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Moll, Rudolf Beat, genannt Ruedi, von Basel, in Hombrechtikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005724023, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
IC information company AG, in Pratteln, CHE-426.459.690, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2022, Publ. 1005627010).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Geisser, Bernhard, von Altstätten, in Glarus Nord, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.