Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Lenz & Staehelin Aktiengesellschaft
Bleicherweg 58
8002 Zürich
Reports for HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.05.1981
Deletion from the commercial register
20.06.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.000.108-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.554.017
Sector
Management of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung von Hotelbetrieben, Kongresszentren und Tourismuskomplexen in der Schweiz; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und diese finanzieren.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 19.06.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz SA en liquidation)
- HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz Ltd in liquidation)
- HPIS Hotel Property Investments [Switzerland] Ltd
- HPIS Hotel Property Investments [Suisse] SA
- HPIS Hotel Property Investments Schweiz AG
- Ramada AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3589755, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) AG in Liquidation, in Zürich, CHE-101.554.017, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 24.12.2014, Publ. 1900533). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 1900533, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) AG, in Zürich, CHE-101.554.017, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 15.11.2012, Publ. 6932596).
Firma neu:
HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) SA en liquidation) (HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) Ltd in liquidation).
Domizil neu:
c/o Lenz & Staehelin Aktiengesellschaft , Bleicherweg 58, 8002 Zürich.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 11.12.2014 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kokshoorn, Robertus Johannes Leonardus, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Coppet, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Szwarc, Leila, argentinische Staatsangehörige, in Nyon, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rodrigues Albuquerque Neves, Isabel Maria, portugiesische Staatsangehörige, in Chêne-Bourg, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-106.839.438), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: PricewaterhouseCoopers AG];
Blum, Walter C., von Wald ZH, in Zug, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6932596, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
HPIS Hotel Property Investments (Schweiz) AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.000.108-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 31.03.2010, S. 28, Publ. 5568006).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vonmoos, Jorg, von Genève, in Lancy, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Szwarc, Leila, argentinische Staatsangehörige, in Nyon, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rodrigues Albuquerque Neves, Isabel Maria, portugiesische Staatsangehörige, in Chêne-Bourg, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.