Reports for Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG
- Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG has its legal headquarters in Diesbach GL and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Electrical power production and utilities».
- The management of the company Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG, which was founded on the 12.08.2003, consists of 5 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 20.09.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-110.176.167.
Management (5)
newest board members
Johannes Schiesser,
Michael Trachsler,
Peter Walser,
Wolfgang Eduard Maria Weber-Thedy,
Dr. iur. Matthias Eppenberger
newest authorized signatories
Johannes Schiesser,
Michael Trachsler,
Peter Walser,
Wolfgang Eduard Maria Weber-Thedy,
Dr. iur. Matthias Eppenberger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.08.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Süd
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.004.217-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.176.167
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf, Entwicklung und Betrieb von Wasserkraftwerken; Produktion und Verkauf von elektrischer Energie auf ökologisch und ökonomisch sinnvolle Weise. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt Liegenschaften zu erwerben, zu belasten und zu veräussern. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
E. Luchsinger Revision & Treuhand AG | Glarus Süd | 20.09.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Unirevisa Beratungs- und Verwaltungs AG | Glarus | <2004 | 19.09.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005564978, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-110.176.167, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 13.05.2022, Publ. 1005473009).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Unirevisa Beratungs- und Verwaltungs AG (CHE-107.925.299), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
E. Luchsinger Revision & Treuhand AG (CHE-106.417.445), in Nidfurn (Glarus Süd), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005473009, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-110.176.167, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 82 vom 30.04.2018, Publ. 4201443).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walser, Dr. Hanspeter, von Wald AR, in Urnäsch, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weber-Thedy, Wolfgang Eduard Maria, von Männedorf, in Männedorf, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Weber-Thedy, Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich];
Schiesser, Johannes, genannt Hannes, von Glarus Süd, in Schwanden GL (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Trachsler, Michael, von Nesslau, in Elm (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Walser, Peter, von Wald (AR), in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eppenberger, Dr. Matthias, von Neckertal, in Zollikerberg (Zollikon), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von St. Peterzell, in Zug].
Publication number: 4201443, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Hochdruckkraftwerk Diesbach AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-110.176.167, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2011, Publ. 6137102).
Domizil neu:
Maschinenstrasse 6, 8777 Diesbach GL.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Unirevisa Beratungs- und Verwaltungs AG (CHE-107.925.299), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Unirevisa Beratungs- und Verwaltungs AG (CH-160.3.001.557-6)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.