Address
c/o Marcel Gehrig
Brunnenwiese 55
8132 Egg b. Zürich
Reports for Henssler-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Henssler-Stiftung
- Henssler-Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Egg b. Zürich and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The organization was founded on 09.01.2008.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 03.06.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.015.853.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Ursula Margrit Schmid,
Petra Tschannen,
Wolfgang Gerhards,
Marcel Gehrig
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.01.2008
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Egg
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.489-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.015.853
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Stiftung ist: Die Förderung besonders begabter junger Menschen durch Leistung finanzieller Beiträge zur Aus-, Fort- und Weiterbildung sowie die gezielte Projektförderung in diesen Bereichen. Die Unterstützung von Lebens- und Wohnformen in der nachberuflichen Zeit. Die Stiftung verfolgt weder Erwerbs- noch Gewinnzwecke. Sie ist dort tätig, wo für die Erreichung des Stiftungszwecks keine öffentlichen Gelder zur Verfügung stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Resida Treuhand und Wirtschaftsprüfungs GmbH | Kirchberg (SG) | 15.01.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Henssler-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005487517, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Henssler-Stiftung, in Egg, CHE-114.015.853, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 22.07.2021, Publ. 1005255173).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mathys, Arthur, von Koppigen, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005255173, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Henssler-Stiftung, in Egg, CHE-114.015.853, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2017, S.0, Publ. 3357161).
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Ursula Schmid, Ahornweg 6, 8134 Adliswil.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Ursula Margrit, von Zürich, in Adliswil, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Berg am Irchel].
Publication number: 3357161, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Henssler-Stiftung, in Egg, CHE-114.015.853, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 07.01.2016, Publ. 2581371).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Henssler, Erich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Resida Treuhand und Wirtschaftsprüfungs GmbH (CHE-104.941.221), in Kirchberg SG, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Resida Treuhand und Wirtschaftsprüfungs GmbH, in Kirchberg SG (CH-320.4.045.663-4)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.