Reports for Heli-Züri AG Volketswil
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Heli-Züri AG Volketswil
- Heli-Züri AG Volketswil with its legal headquarters in Hegnau is active. Heli-Züri AG Volketswil operates in the sector «Other services in education».
- The management of the company Heli-Züri AG Volketswil, which was founded on the 09.08.2011, consists of 3 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 05.07.2017.
- The reported UID is CHE-265.438.710.
- Companies with the same address as Heli-Züri AG Volketswil: Alphaplan AG (Reinigungen), Wohlfahrtsfonds Alphaplan.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.08.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Volketswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.036.905-7
UID/VAT
CHE-265.438.710
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Betreibung einer Hubschrauber-Flugschule, die Vermietung von Hubschraubern, Transporte aller Art mit Hubschraubern sowie sämtliche Dienstleistungen im Zusammenhang mit Hubschraubern. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, alle damit in Zusammenhang stehenden Geschäfte zu tätigen. Sie ist insbesondere berechtigt, ihren Betrieb auf geeignete Branchen auszudehnen, sich an anderen Firmen und Unternehmungen ihrer oder wesensverwandter Branchen zu beteiligen, sowie Liegenschaften zu erwerben und zu verkaufen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Heli-Züri AG Volketswil
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3623257, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Heli-Züri AG Volketswil, in Volketswil, CHE-265.438.710, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2011, Publ. 6293014).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brun, Guido, von Malters, in Teufen AR, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6293014, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Heli-Züri AG Volketswil, in Volketswil, CH-020.3.036.905-7, Zürcherstrasse 40, 8604 Hegnau, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
03.08.2011.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Betreibung einer Hubschrauber-Flugschule, die Vermietung von Hubschraubern, Transporte aller Art mit Hubschraubern sowie sämtliche Dienstleistungen im Zusammenhang mit Hubschraubern. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, alle damit in Zusammenhang stehenden Geschäfte zu tätigen. Sie ist insbesondere berechtigt, ihren Betrieb auf geeignete Branchen auszudehnen, sich an anderen Firmen und Unternehmungen ihrer oder wesensverwandter Branchen zu beteiligen, sowie Liegenschaften zu erwerben und zu verkaufen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 23.06.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Sartory, Max, von Wil SG, in Wangen-Brüttisellen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brennwald, Manfred, von Männedorf, in Bichelsee-Balterswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brun, Guido, von Malters, in Teufen AR, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sartory, Adrian, von Wil SG, in Wangen-Brüttisellen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.