Reports for Hathor AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hathor AG
- Hathor AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Arlesheim. Hathor AG belongs to the industry «Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 31.12.1998.
- On the 14.07.2009 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BL under the UID CHE-101.003.088.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.12.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arlesheim
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.001.967-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.003.088
Sector
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von kulturellen (Konzertagentur, Musikausbildung, CD-Produktionen, Ausstellungen, Veranstaltungen), therapeutischen (Malen, Plastizieren, Sprachgestaltung, Eurythmie, Grundlagenforschung der homöopathischen und anthroposophischen Medizin) und wirtschaftlichen (Gastgewerbe, Detailhandel, Liegenschaftsverwaltung) Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen eröffnen, sich an Unternehmen ähnlicher Art im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum im In- und Ausland erwerben und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann im übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
JURA TREUHAND AG | Sissach | 17.02.2006 | 13.07.2009 | |
FRS Frey Treuhand | Oberwil (BL) | <2004 | 16.02.2006 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hathor AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5135486, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hathor AG, in Arlesheim, CH-280.3.001.967-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 17.02.2006, S. 4, Publ. 3249734).
Statutenänderung:
29.06.2009.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von kulturellen (Konzertagentur, Musikausbildung, CD-Produktionen, Ausstellungen, Veranstaltungen), therapeutischen (Malen, Plastizieren, Sprachgestaltung, Eurythmie, Grundlagenforschung der homöopathischen und anthroposophischen Medizin) und wirtschaftlichen (Gastgewerbe, Detailhandel, Liegenschaftsverwaltung) Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen eröffnen, sich an Unternehmen ähnlicher Art im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum im In- und Ausland erwerben und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann im übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 29.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
JURA TREUHAND AG, in Oberwil BL, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Abbühl, Emanuel, von Därstetten, in Arlesheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates];
Vandroogenbroeck Abbühl, Nathalie, von Därstetten und Basel, in Arlesheim, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates].
Publication number: 3249734, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hathor AG, in Arlesheim, CH-280.3.001.967-0, Erbringung von kulturellen und wirtschaftlichen Dienstleistungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 11.02.2004, S. 5, Publ. 2113388).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
FRS Frey Treuhand, in Oberwil BL, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
JURA TREUHAND AG, in Oberwil BL, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2113388, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hathor AG, in Arlesheim, Erbringung von kulturellen (Konzertagentur, Ausstellungen, Veranstaltungen), therapeutischen (Malen, Plastizieren, Sprachgestaltung, Eurhythmie, Grundlagenforschung der homöopatischen und anthroposophischen Medizin) und wirtschaftlichen (Gastgewerbe, Detailhandel, Liegenschaftsverwaltung) Dienstleistungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 07.01.1999, S. 81).
Domizil neu:
Hangstrasse 39, 4144 Arlesheim.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Triforma AG, in Arlesheim, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
FRS Frey Treuhand, in Oberwil BL, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.