Branches (1)
Reports for Hans Reich AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hans Reich AG
- Hans Reich AG is currently active and the industry «Business management and administration». The legal headquarters are in Basel.
- The management of the company Hans Reich AG, which was founded on the 27.09.1966, consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.08.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Hans Reich AG is the following: CHE-105.815.056.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Denise Nicole Reich-Nobs,
Livio Carlo Domeniconi,
Roland Reich
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.09.1966
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.004.485-4
UID/VAT
CHE-105.815.056
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Aushub-, Tiefbau- und Belagsarbeiten sowie Vermietung von Baumaschinen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an gleichen oder ähnlichen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BMF ProConsulting AG | Basel | 24.10.2014 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Averis Treuhand AG | Basel | 26.09.2013 | 23.10.2014 | |
Hoffmann & Partner AG | Basel | 10.10.2012 | 25.09.2013 | |
Strafin Treuhand AG | Allschwil | 30.11.2010 | 09.10.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Reich Hans AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hans Reich AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005541041, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Hans Reich AG, in Basel, CHE-105.815.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 24.10.2014, S.0, Publ. 1785807).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Domeniconi, Livio Carlo, von Capriasca, in Allschwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Reich-Nobs, Denise Nicole, von Sennwald, in Beckenried, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1785807, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Hans Reich AG, in Basel, CHE-105.815.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2013, Publ. 1096569).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Averis Treuhand AG (CHE-395.438.402), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BMF ProConsulting AG (CHE-104.127.516), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1096569, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Hans Reich AG, in Basel, CH-270.3.004.485-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 10.10.2012, Publ. 6884982).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hoffmann & Co AG (CHE-212.919.342), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Averis Treuhand AG (CHE-395.438.402)[CH-270.3.014.865-6], in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.