Reports for H. Steiner Treuhand GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout H. Steiner Treuhand GmbH
- H. Steiner Treuhand GmbH has its legal headquarters in Pfäffikon SZ and is active. It operates in the sector «Fiduciary services».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.12.2019. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register SZ under the UID CHE-108.680.752.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.1997
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Freienbach
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.009.136-4
UID/VAT
CHE-108.680.752
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Umfassende Tätigkeit auf dem Treuhandsektor, insbesondere Buchführung und Rechnungswesen, Steuern, Verwaltung und Gesellschaftsgründung. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: H. Steiner Treuhand GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004786452, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
H. Steiner Treuhand GmbH, in Freienbach, CHE-108.680.752, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 02.11.2017, Publ. 3846293).
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: Bitzihofstrasse 17, 8854 Siebnen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner, Hans, von Schwyz, in Freienbach, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 30 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Steiner, David, von Schwyz, in Freienbach, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3846293, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
SEAC GmbH, in Freienbach, CHE-108.680.752, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 06.11.2009, Publ. 5330298).
Statutenänderung:
26.10.2017.
Firma neu:
H. Steiner Treuhand GmbH.
Domizil neu:
Felsenstrasse 12, 8808 Pfäffikon SZ.
Weitere Adressen:
Bitzihofstrasse 17, 8854 Siebnen.
Zweck neu:
Umfassende Tätigkeit auf dem Treuhandsektor, insbesondere Buchführung und Rechnungswesen, Steuern, Verwaltung und Gesellschaftsgründung. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. [Weitere Statutenänderungen sind nicht publikationspflichtig.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bamert, Urs, von Tuggen, in Rapperswil-Jona, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Marty, Rolf, von Oberiberg, in Einsiedeln, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner-Brändli, Ursula, von Schwyz, in Freienbach, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Steiner, Hans, von Schwyz, in Freienbach, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 30 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00].
Publication number: 5330298, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
SEAC GmbH, in Freienbach, CH-130.0.009.136-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 11.09.2006, S. 14, Publ. 3544580). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 2.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.