Reports for Guenat Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Guenat Holding SA
- Guenat Holding SA is active in the industry «Operation of investment companies» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Les Breuleux.
- The management of the company Guenat Holding SA consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 17.10.1991.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 27.12.2021.
- In the commercial register the company Guenat Holding SA is registered under the UID CHE-101.970.114.
- Companies with the same address as Guenat Holding SA: Horométrie SA, Moneta Holding SA, Parlinton Immobilière SA.
Management (3)
newest board members
Dominique Roger Oscar Guenat,
Andrée Germaine Thérèse Guenat-Jobin
newest authorized signatories
Dominique Roger Oscar Guenat,
Andrée Germaine Thérèse Guenat-Jobin,
Jeanne Guenat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.10.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Les Breuleux
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-674.3.000.211-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.970.114
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition et administration de participations
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Transjurane SA | Delémont | 25.11.2005 | 11.07.2016 | |
C.M. Management Services S.A. | Soyhières | 27.04.2005 | 24.11.2005 | |
Vigilis SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | <2004 | 26.04.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Guenat Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005369394, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Guenat Holding SA, à Les Breuleux, CHE-101.970.114, société anonyme (No. FOSC 168 du 02.09.2019, Publ. 1004707540).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Guenat, Dominique, de Le Noirmont, à Les Bois, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature individuelle];
Guenat-Jobin, Andrée Germaine Thérèse, de Le Noirmont, à Les Bois, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Guenat, Jeanne, de Le Noirmont, à Le Noirmont, directrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004707540, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Guenat Holding SA, à Les Breuleux, CHE-101.970.114, société anonyme (No. FOSC 45 du 06.03.2017, Publ. 3386209).
Modification des statuts:
26.08.2019.
Nouvelles actions:
100'000 actions nominatives de CHF 1.00 [précédemment: 100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 3386209, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Guenat Holding SA, à Les Breuleux, CHE-101.970.114, société anonyme (No. FOSC 133 du 12.07.2016, Publ. 2948575).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Guenat, Dominique, de Le Noirmont, à Les Bois, administrateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Le Noirmont, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.