Branches (1)
Reports for GÖRG SUTER AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GÖRG SUTER AG
- GÖRG SUTER AG has its legal headquarters in Thal and is active. It operates in the sector «Notary and advocate office».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 02.10.2014.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.10.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company GÖRG SUTER AG is the following: CHE-349.515.695.
- Next to the company GÖRG SUTER AG there are 5 other active companies with an identical address. These include: FensterProjekt.ch GmbH, ImmoProjekt.ch AG, PhysioSam, Inhaberin Samantha Fässler.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thal
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.076.460-2
UID/VAT
CHE-349.515.695
Sector
Notary and advocate office
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Rechtsdienstleistungen im In- und Ausland durch in der Schweiz registrierte Anwältinnen und Anwälte sowie Ausbildung von angehenden Anwältinnen und Anwälten; diese Tätigkeiten erbringt die Gesellschaft auf Grundlage eines ganzheitlichen Managements. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen gründen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GÖRG SUTER AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005322106, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2021 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 11'393 vom 20.10.2021 GÖRG SUTER AG, in Thal, CHE-349.515.695, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2021, Publ. 1005319294).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Görg, Dominic, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in St. Peter (Arosa), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005319294, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
GÖRG SUTER AG, in Thal, CHE-349.515.695, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2019, Publ. 1004665196).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suter, Matthias, von Aesch ZH, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Görg, Dominic, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in St. Peter (Arosa), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004665196, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
GÖRG SUTER AG, in Thal, CHE-349.515.695, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 04.12.2017, S.0, Publ. 3907523).
Domizil neu:
Wiesentalstrasse 1, 9425 Thal.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.