Branches (1)
Reports for Gobat Génie Civil SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gobat Génie Civil SA
- Gobat Génie Civil SA with its legal headquarters in Courgenay is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Road, railway and tunnel construction». Gobat Génie Civil SA is active.
- The management of the company Gobat Génie Civil SA consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 14.03.1958.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 29.11.2019. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Gobat Génie Civil SA is registered under the UID CHE-107.213.394.
Management (5)
newest board members
Gaël Gobat,
Didier Georges Paul Gobat,
Muriel Yolande Lucette Gobat
newest authorized signatories
Gaël Gobat,
David Lehmann,
Pierre-André Mosimann,
Didier Georges Paul Gobat,
Muriel Yolande Lucette Gobat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.03.1958
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Courgenay
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-677.3.000.075-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.213.394
Sector
Road, railway and tunnel construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entreprise de génie civil et de construction de routes, fabrication, achat, vente et transport de tout matériel de construction, acquisition, administration et aliénation d'immeubles, ainsi que toutes opérations industrielles, commerciales et financières s'y rattachant.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDAG Jura SA | Delémont | 29.11.2019 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Transjurane SA | Delémont | 29.12.2010 | 28.11.2019 | |
Fiduciaire Jean-Claude Courtet SA | Delémont | 08.12.2008 | 28.12.2010 | |
Fiduciaire Simon Kohler S.A. | Courgenay | <2004 | 07.12.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Albert Comment SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gobat Génie Civil SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004771767, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Gobat Génie Civil SA, à Courgenay, CHE-107.213.394, société anonyme (No. FOSC 194 du 08.10.2018, Publ. 1004472072).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
FIDAG Jura SA (CHE-105.190.411), à Delémont, organe de révision [précédemment: Audit Transjurane SA (CH-670.3.002.594-8)].
Publication number: HR02-1004472072, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Gobat Génie Civil SA, à Courgenay, CHE-107.213.394, société anonyme (No. FOSC 191 du 03.10.2018, Publ. 1004468753).
Nouvelle succursale:
Delémont (CHE-425.398.293).
Publication number: HR02-1004468753, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Albert Comment S.A., à Courgenay, CHE-107.213.394, société anonyme (No. FOSC 254 du 29.12.2010, Publ. 5966886).
Modification des statuts:
30.08.2018.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Gobat Génie Civil SA.
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux actionnaires: par lettre ou par courriel.
Nouvelle restriction à la transmissibilité:
Restriction à la transmissibilité des actions nominatives: selon statuts. [biffé: Restriction de transmissibilité des actions selon statuts.].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Houlmann, Didier, de Montmelon, à Courtemautruy (Courgenay), avec procuration collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gobat, Gaël, de Crémines, à Delémont, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Gobat, Muriel Yolande Lucette, de Haute-Sorne et Crémines, à Delémont, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: Gobat, Muriel, de Undervelier et Crémines, membre, avec signature individuelle];
Mosimann, Pierre André, de Sumiswald, à Courroux, directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: Mosimann, Pierre-André, sans fonction inscrite, avec procuration collective à deux];
Lehmann, David, de Lyssach, à Delémont, avec procuration collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.