Reports for Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel
- Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel is currently active and the industry «Research and development». The legal headquarters are in Basel.
- Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel was founded on 29.10.2009.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 10.03.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-115.169.795.
Management (5)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Susanne Pfenninger Wyss,
Stefanie Mahr von Staszewski,
Dr. Vincenzo Allia,
Martin Meyer,
Dr. Rainer Matthias Zeh
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.10.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.014.213-7
UID/VAT
CHE-115.169.795
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Geologie, Hydrogeologie, Geotechnik, Naturgefahren, Altlasten und Umwelt sowie anverwandter Gebiete. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen eröffnen, sich an andern inländischen oder ausländischen Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck beteiligen, solche Unternehmungen erwerben oder selbst errichten. Sie kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Grundstücke oder Rechte daran erwerben, verpfänden oder veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schönenberger Die Treuhänder AG | Muri bei Bern | 25.07.2012 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CV Treuhand AG | Solothurn | 24.08.2011 | 24.07.2012 | |
BDO AG | Bern | 04.11.2009 | 24.03.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005120252, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 40 vom 26.02.2021 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 1'158 vom 23.02.2021 Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel, in Basel, CHE-115.169.795, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 26.02.2021, Publ. 1005111008).
Weitere Adressen:
Riedmattweg 16, 4116 Metzerlen. [nicht: Weitere Adresse: Bielackerstr. 2, 4412 Nuglar-St. Pantaleon.]
Publication number: HR02-1005111008, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel, in Basel, CHE-115.169.795, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 30.03.2020, Publ. 1004862248).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Guldenfels, Lorenz, von Basel, in Basel, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, stellvertretender Geschäftsleiter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfenninger Wyss, Susanne , von Zürich, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, stellvertretende Geschäftsleiterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004862248, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Geotechnisches Institut AG Basel, in Basel, CHE-115.169.795, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2018, Publ. 4207145).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vögtli, Dr. Beat, von Basel, in Basel, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mahr von Staszewski, Stefanie, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Rheinfelden (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.