Reports for Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus
- Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus with its legal headquarters in Basel is active. Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 8 active persons registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 01.11.2019. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.979.958.
Management (8)
newest members of the administration
Florence Becher,
Maria Mambelli Johnson,
Peter Stieger,
Antoinette Hainke,
Stephanie Knupp
newest authorized signatories
Florence Becher,
Peter Stieger,
Stephan Weippert,
Marcel Thommen-Spozio
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.05.1970
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.5.000.095-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.979.958
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Genossenschaftsverband bezweckt die Errichtung und die Vermietung von Wohnungen insbesondere für Betagte sowie IV-Anspruchsberechtigte. Er kann Liegenschaften und Baurechte erwerben oder veräussern sowie alle Verträge abschliessen, die mit seinem Zweck direkt oder indirekt in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Tätigkeit des Genossenschaftsverbandes ist gemeinnützig. Die Mitgliedschaft bei Dachorganisationen gemeinnütziger Wohnbauträger ist möglich. Der Genossenschaftsverband sucht seinen Zweck zu erreichen (a) durch Erwerb von Bauland und Baurechten, (b) durch Bau und Erwerb von geeigneten Häusern, (c) durch Vermietung der Wohnungen zu Mietzinsen, die auf Basis der Kostenmiete unter Berücksichtigung der wirtschaftlichen Selbsterhaltung festzusetzen sind, (d) durch Investitionen in die bestehenden Bauten im Sinne eines sorgfältigen laufenden Unterhalts und periodischer Erneuerung, (e) durch Errichtung von Ersatzneubauten, wenn die bestehenden Bauten nicht mehr auf eine wirtschaftlich vertretbare Art und Weise erneuert werden können; (f) durch Ermöglichung weiterer gemeinschaftlicher Aktivitäten in administrativen sowie technischen Bereichen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BMF ProConsulting AG | Basel | 25.07.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Basel | 14.07.2010 | 24.07.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Genossenschaftsverband Gotthelf-Iselin-Quartier
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004750508, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus, in Basel, CHE-107.979.958, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2017, Publ. 3948277).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bodmer, Ciara, von Wald (ZH), in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Becher, Florence, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Knupp, Stephanie, von Grossdietwil, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mambelli Johnson, Maria, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Sekretärin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3948277, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus, in Basel, CHE-107.979.958, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2017, Publ. 3725509).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schrandt, Rolf, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3725509, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaftsverband Pilatus, in Basel, CHE-107.979.958, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2016, Publ. 2899629).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imoberdorf, Albin, von Ulrichen, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bodmer, Ciara, von Wald (ZH), in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.