Reports for Genossenschaft el Comedor
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft el Comedor
- Genossenschaft el Comedor from Zürich operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The organization was founded on 13.04.2012 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 04.11.2022. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Genossenschaft el Comedor is the following: CHE-299.401.811.
- LinguaPlus Fumasoli, Swiss HTTP GmbH, Ziemann Engineering are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.04.2012
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.5.000.474-0
UID/VAT
CHE-299.401.811
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Genossenschaft ist die selbstorganisierte Versorgung mit Grundnahrungsmitteln und Haushaltsartikeln, deren Bedarf die GenossenschafterInnen regelmässig gemeinsam analysieren. Die Produkte sollen, wenn immer möglich, direkt bei Produzenten bezogen oder selbst produziert werden, um ökologische und soziale Standards im Kollektiv überprüfen zu können. Die Genossenschaft zeichnet sich insbesondere durch die langfristige gemeinsame Planung von Produktion und Verbrauch aus. Die Genossenschaft ist nicht gewinnorientiert; allfällige Überschüsse werden für den Genossenschaftszweck verwendet.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft el Comedor
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005597172, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft el Comedor, in Zürich, CHE-299.401.811, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 18.02.2020, Publ. 1004832376).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heller, Olivier Markus, von Luzern, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Käser, Jessica, von Sisseln, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Peter, Noemi, von Radelfingen, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wiedmer, Kai, von Buchholterberg, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burri, Dominik, von Rüschegg, in Oberengstringen, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bayer, Manuel, von Rothenthurm, in Hombrechtikon, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gruber, Wenzel, von Bodio, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Helg, Jasmin, von Bettwiesen, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004832376, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft el Comedor, in Zürich, CHE-299.401.811, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 27.01.2020, Publ. 1004814266).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heller, Olivier Markus, von Luzern, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Luzern].
Publication number: HR02-1004814266, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft el Comedor, in Zürich, CHE-299.401.811, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2019, Publ. 1004581004).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zimmermann, Tobias, von Zürich, in Bäretswil, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Maggi, Piera, von Castel San Pietro, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heller, Olivier Markus, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wiedmer, Kai, von Buchholterberg, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.