Address
c/o Andreas Wyer
Rottenbett 8
3931 Lalden
Reports for Gebrüder Wyer AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gebrüder Wyer AG
- Gebrüder Wyer AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Lalden. Gebrüder Wyer AG belongs to the industry «Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)» and is currently active.
- Gebrüder Wyer AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 21.03.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-108.025.889.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.03.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lalden
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.000.858-2
UID/VAT
CHE-108.025.889
Sector
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Küchenbau- Bodenbelags- und Papeziererunternehmens sowie jegliche Innenausbauarbeiten; Beteiligung an gleichen oder verwandten Unternehmen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Steiner und Partner Treuhand AG | Brig-Glis | 07.03.2017 | 06.11.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wyer Gebrüder AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gebrüder Wyer AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005991821, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Gebrüder Wyer AG, in Lalden, CHE-108.025.889, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 07.11.2018, Publ. 1004492784).
Domizil neu:
c/o Andreas Wyer, Rottenbett 8, 3931 Lalden.
Publication number: HR02-1004492784, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Gebrüder Wyer AG, in Lalden, CHE-108.025.889, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2017, Publ. 3388719). Gemäss Erklärung vom 15.10.2018 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiner und Pfaffen Treuhand AG (CHE-108.267.027), in Brig-Glis, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3388719, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Gebrüder Wyer AG, in Lalden, CHE-108.025.889, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2013, Publ. 1096635).
Statutenänderung:
24.02.2017.
Domizil neu:
c/o Andreas Wyer, Zenstadeln 7, 3931 Lalden.
Aktien neu:
50 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00. [bisher: 50 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Publikationsorgan neu:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, Telefax oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Die übrigen Änderungen betreffen die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen nicht.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wyer, Burkhard, von Lalden, in Lalden, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zimmermann Ernest, in Eggerberg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyer, Andreas, von Lalden, in Lalden, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Steiner und Pfaffen Treuhand AG (CHE-108.267.027), in Brig-Glis, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.