Reports for Gailland Fils SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gailland Fils SA
- Gailland Fils SA has its legal headquarters in Verbier and is active. It operates in the sector «Masonry».
- The management of the company Gailland Fils SA, which was founded on the 18.09.1990, consists of 2 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.01.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.768.772.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.09.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Val de Bagnes
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.2.005.062-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.768.772
Sector
Masonry
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une entreprise de déneigement et de transports, de génie civil, de maçonnerie, de désamiantage et de tous travaux liés à la construction; la société peut effectuer toutes opérations financières ou commerciales en rapport avec son but ou aptes à le favoriser; elle peut participer à d'autres entreprises et constituer des succursales et des filiales, tant en Suisse qu'à l'étranger; elle peut accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des actionnaires ou des tiers si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BYC Fiduciaire SA | Martigny | 22.01.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alpina Révision Verbier SA | Val de Bagnes | 10.06.2022 | 21.01.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gailland Fils & Cie
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gailland Fils SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005946838, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Rectification de l'inscription au registre journalier No 199 du 17.01.2024, publiée dans la FOSC No 14 du 22.01.2024, p. 1'005'940'673. Gailland Fils SA, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-108.768.772, société anonyme (No. FOSC 14 du 22.01.2024, Publ. 1005940673).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
BYC Fiduciaire SA (CHE-281.562.679), à Martigny, organe de révision [non: B.Y.C Fiduciaire SA (CHE-281.562.679), à Riddes].
Publication number: HR02-1005940673, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Gailland Fils SA, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-108.768.772, société anonyme (No. FOSC 111 du 10.06.2022, Publ. 1005493029).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Alpina Révision Verbier SA (CHE-114.897.320), à Val de Bagnes, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
B.Y.C Fiduciaire SA (CHE-281.562.679), à Riddes, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005493029, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Gailland Fils SA, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-108.768.772, société anonyme (No. FOSC 66 du 07.04.2021, Publ. 1005142847). [biffé: Selon déclaration du 23.06.2016, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint].
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Alpina Révision Verbier SA (CHE-114.897.320), à Val de Bagnes, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.