Reports for Fuchsbau Architekten AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fuchsbau Architekten AG
- Fuchsbau Architekten AG from Näfels operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities» and is active.
- The company was founded on 03.12.2004.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 05.01.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-112.133.648.
- Companies with the same address as Fuchsbau Architekten AG: Fritz Landolt Aktiengesellschaft, FUCHS IMMO GmbH, Fuchs Immobilien AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Nadja Kälin,
Reto Jäggi,
Manuel Willy Zweifel,
Markus Oertli
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.12.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Nord
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.004.372-6
UID/VAT
CHE-112.133.648
CHE-424.484.174 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Projektierung, Planung und Realisierung von Bauten, Einrichtungen und Anlagen aller Art, als Einzel- oder Gesamtleistung; sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder solche gründen, erwerben, pachten, finanzieren, mit solchen fusionieren, wie überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in Zusammenhang stehen oder in deren Interesse erscheinen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
VTB Verwaltung, Treuhand und Beratung AG | Glarus Nord | 29.09.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Verita Immobilien und Treuhand AG | Glarus Nord | 09.12.2004 | 28.09.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fritz Noser Architekturbüro AG
- Fritz Noser AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fuchsbau Architekten AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005926032, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Fuchsbau Architekten AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-112.133.648, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2022, Publ. 1005374042).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eberhard, Tanja Tamara, von Schänis, in Wetzikon ZH, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jäggi, Reto, von Glarus, in Haslen GL (Glarus Süd), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied;
Kälin, Nadja, von Glarus Nord, in Glarus, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Publication number: HR02-1005374042, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Fuchsbau Architekten AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-112.133.648, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2020, Publ. 1004988005).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fuchs, Walter, von Malters, in Näfels (Glarus Nord), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fuchs, Reto Walter, von Malters, in Glarus, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zweifel, Manuel, von Glarus Süd, in Haslen GL (Glarus Süd), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Haslen (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Eberhard, Tanja Tamara, von Schänis, in Wetzikon ZH, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004988005, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Fuchsbau Architekten AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-112.133.648, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2020, Publ. 1004797976).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
VTB Verwaltung, Treuhand und Beratung AG (CHE-106.907.413), in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
VTB Verwaltung, Treuhand und Beratung AG (CHE-101.686.179), in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.