Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for FOSTAC Immobilien AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.12.1991
Deletion from the commercial register
01.02.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberuzwil
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.033.599-5
UID/VAT
CHE-108.752.498
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf und Verkauf sowie die Vermietung von Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Albas Treuhand AG | Zürich | 07.09.2010 | 22.10.2014 | |
Consultive Revisions AG | Winterthur | 22.08.2008 | 06.09.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FOSTAC Immobilien SA
- FOSTAC Immobilien Ltd
- Paul Keller Stickerei AG
- Keller Paul Stickerei AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FOSTAC Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3320471, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
FOSTAC Immobilien AG, in Oberuzwil, CHE-108.752.498, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 23.10.2014, Publ. 1784743). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die FOSTAC AG, in Oberuzwil (CHE-106.506.847), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 1784743, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
FOSTAC Immobilien AG, in Jonschwil, CHE-108.752.498, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2014, Publ. 1622995).
Statutenänderung:
15.10.2014.
Sitz neu:
Oberuzwil.
Domizil neu:
Dorfstrasse 28, 9248 Bichwil. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 15.10.2014 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Handermann, Alfons, von Winterthur und Untereggen, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Seelhofer, Hans, von Kehrsatz, in Henau (Uzwil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Albas Treuhand AG (CH-020.3.911.554-3), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Seelhofer, Bernhard, von Kehrsatz, in Oberuzwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Messmer, Daniel, von Amriswil, in Oberuzwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1622995, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
FOSTAC Immobilien AG, in Jonschwil, CHE-108.752.498, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 24.09.2010, S. 13, Publ. 5825334).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Glogg, Alexander, von Meilen, in Weinfelden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.