Reports for forty7 AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout forty7 AG
- forty7 AG with its legal headquarters in Engelberg is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Services regarding management consulting». forty7 AG is active.
- The company was founded on 05.07.2007.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 17.07.2020.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of OW is CHE-113.720.469.
Management (3)
newest board members
Manuel Rüede,
Marianne E. Steinemann,
Dieter Joseph Pedro Steinemann
newest authorized signatories
Manuel Rüede,
Marianne E. Steinemann,
Dieter Joseph Pedro Steinemann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.07.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Engelberg
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.031.226-0
UID/VAT
CHE-113.720.469
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung von Unternehmen und Instituten über deren Marktauftritt und Produkte sowie die Erbringung von allen weiteren Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Marketing und Verkauf. Die Gesellschaft kann Treuhandgeschäfte tätigen sowie Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften und Grundstücke im In- und Ausland erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle weiteren Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, den Gesellschaftszweck zu fördern, einschliesslich des Erwerbs und der Verwertung von Lizenzen sowie Patenten und anderen immateriellen Gütern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
STM Steuerberatung & Treuhand Mettler AG | Zürich | 11.07.2007 | 10.08.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: forty7 AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004939286, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
forty7 AG, in Pfäffikon, CHE-113.720.469, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2020, Publ. 1004932570). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Engelberg im Handelsregister des Kantons Obwalden eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004939449, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
forty7 AG, bisher in Pfäffikon, CHE-113.720.469, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2020, Publ. 1004932570).
Statutenänderung:
23.06.2020.
Sitz neu:
Engelberg.
Domizil neu:
Margritenweg 2b, 6390 Engelberg. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Publication number: HR02-1004932570, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2020 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 24772 vom 29.06.2020 forty7 AG, in Pfäffikon, CHE-113.720.469, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2020, Publ. 1004926157).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steinemann, Dieter Joseph Pedro, von Zürich, in Engelberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: in Bösingen];
Steinemann, Marianne E., von Zürich, in Engelberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: in Bösingen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.