Reports for Forster & Hasler Gesamtlösungen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Forster & Hasler Gesamtlösungen AG
- Forster & Hasler Gesamtlösungen AG from St. Urban operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The company was founded on 25.07.2011 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 04.03.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-486.379.020.
- Forster AG Bauunternehmung, Forster Plan AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.07.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pfaffnau
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.793.277-2
UID/VAT
CHE-486.379.020
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf und Verkauf von Bauland und Immobilien; Entwicklung und Realisierung von Projekten als General- und Totalunternehmerin; Entwicklung und Überbauung von Liegenschaften, dabei tritt sie als Werkherstellerin auf; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum; Vornahme von Finanzierungen; Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
DW Treuhand AG | Moosleerau | 28.07.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Forster & Hasler Totalunternehmung AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Forster & Hasler Gesamtlösungen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004579115, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Forster & Hasler Totalunternehmung AG, in Pfaffnau, CHE-486.379.020, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2017, Publ. 3610841).
Statutenänderung:
26.02.2019.
Firma neu:
Forster & Hasler Gesamtlösungen AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Forster, Kilian, von Pfaffnau, in Pfaffnau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Forster, Franziska, von Pfaffnau und Madiswil, in Pfaffnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3610841, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Forster & Hasler Totalunternehmung AG, in Wikon, CHE-486.379.020, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 28.07.2011, Publ. 6276366).
Statutenänderung:
23.06.2017.
Sitz neu:
Pfaffnau.
Domizil neu:
Tundwilerweg 18, 4915 St. Urban.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hasler, Peter, von Madiswil, in Wikon, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Forster, Kilian, von Pfaffnau, in Pfaffnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
DW Treuhand AG (CHE-108.203.033), in Moosleerau, Revisionsstelle [bisher: DW Treuhand AG (CH-400.3.016.358-8)].
Publication number: 6276366, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Forster & Hasler Totalunternehmung AG, in Wikon, CH-100.3.793.277-2, Wagnermatte 2, 4806 Wikon, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
21.07.2011.
Zweck:
Kauf und Verkauf von Bauland und Immobilien;
Entwicklung und Realisierung von Projekten als General- und Totalunternehmerin;
Entwicklung und Überbauung von Liegenschaften, dabei tritt sie als Werkherstellerin auf;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum;
Vornahme von Finanzierungen;
Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Beabsichtigte Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft beabsichtigt, von der Erbengemeinschaft Fritz Plüss durch Ausübung eines von der Beratungsgesellschaft WHP GmbH, in Hergiswil NW (CH-150.4.000.078-9), auf die zu gründende Aktiengesellschaft zu übertragendes Kaufrechts die Liegenschaft Grundbuch Murgenthal Nr. 705, Kat. Plan 4, Parzelle Nr. 92 mit Abbruchobjekt Gebäude Nr. 588, zum Maximalpreis von CHF 400'000.00 käuflich zu erwerben.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax.
Eingetragene Personen:
Hasler, Peter, von Madiswil, in Wikon, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Forster, Kilian, von Pfaffnau, in Pfaffnau, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
DW Treuhand AG (CH-400.3.016.358-8), in Moosleerau, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.