Reports for Fondation HorizonSud
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation HorizonSud
- Fondation HorizonSud is active in the industry «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Marsens.
- The management has 10 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 29.12.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-113.324.961.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
David Erard,
Dr. iur. Maurice Daniel Ropraz,
Chantal Rose Marie Robin,
Laurence Brand Corsani,
Gilles Schorderet
newest authorized signatories
Nicolas Gachet,
Liney Milena Noriega Pardo,
David Erard,
Chantal Rose Marie Robin,
Laurence Brand Corsani
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.2006
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Marsens
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.536.758-9
UID/VAT
CHE-113.324.961
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Accueillir et accompagner des personnes souffrant d'handicap psychique en leur offrant des prestations adaptées à leurs besoins. La Fondation ne poursuit pas de but lucratif ou commercial.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PKF Fiduciaire SA, succursale de Fribourg | Fribourg | 01.07.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconsult Bulle SA | Bulle | 23.12.2016 | 30.06.2022 | |
Multifiduciaire Fribourg S.A. | Fribourg | 10.01.2014 | 22.12.2016 | |
Fiduconsult S.A. | Bulle | 21.12.2006 | 09.01.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
ATELIERS CHALAMALA | 03.03.2016 | active | 63315/2015 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation HorizonSud
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005923283, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation HorizonSud, à Marsens, CHE-113.324.961 (FOSC du 20.12.2023, p. 0/1005915481). Rectification de l'inscription n° 8040 du 15.12.2023 (FOSC du 20.12.2023, Id 1005915481): Personne inscrite modifiée: Gachet Nicolas, directeur général, signature collective à deux (et non pas membre de la direction, signature collective à deux).
Publication number: HR02-1005915481, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation HorizonSud, à Marsens, CHE-113.324.961 (FOSC du 28.04.2023, p. 0/1005734579).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Gachet Nicolas, membre de la direction, signature collective à deux entre eux, désormais, membre de la direction, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Noriega Pardo Liney Milena, de Murten FR, à Granges-Paccot, membre de la direction, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005734579, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation HorizonSud, à Marsens, CHE-113.324.961 (FOSC du 01.11.2022, p. 0/1005594832).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Brand Corsani Laurence, membre du conseil de fondation, présidente, signature collective à deux, nouveau nom Brand Laurence.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.