Reports for fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation
- fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation with its legal headquarters in Zürich is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «IT services». fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation is active.
- The management of the company fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation consists of 4 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 03.04.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-110.087.931.
- Next to the company fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation there are 11 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Andreas Di Gallo dipl. Architekt ETH/SIA, De Oliveira Crespo Music, Ernst Hurni AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Adrian Jacobi,
Anne Frenkel,
Urs Lengwiler,
Antonia Ruesch Lengwiler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.06.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.026.794-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.087.931
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung von Kunden in den Bereichen Wissensmanagemen, Document Management, Records Management, historische und sozialwissenschaftliche Forschung.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Aeberli Treuhand AG | Zürich | 21.06.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
WPB AG | Zürich | <2004 | 20.06.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005998921, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation, in Zürich, CHE-110.087.931, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 21.06.2022, Publ. 1005500242).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frenkel, Anne, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jacobi, Adrian, von Günsberg, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005500242, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation, in Zürich, CHE-110.087.931, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2022, Publ. 1005388548).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
WPB AG (CHE-104.527.212), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aeberli Treuhand AG (CHE-101.652.973), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005388548, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
fokus AG für Wissen und Organisation, in Zürich, CHE-110.087.931, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 28.08.2015, S.0, Publ. 2343769).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kauz Schilling, Daniel, von Wyssachen, in Gurtnellen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Desiderato, Simone, von Zürich und deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.