Address
c/o Dominique Gabriel Kolly
Impasse des Ecureuils 2
1724 Ferpicloz
Reports for Expotrans SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Expotrans SA
- Expotrans SA is active in the industry «Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Ferpicloz.
- Expotrans SA was founded on 29.09.2008.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 22.12.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.520.447.
- In the IPI there are 2 trademarks or applications registered by the company Expotrans SA.
Management (4)
newest board members
Jean-Daniel Goetschi,
Lorenzo Antonio Vozza,
Hugo Joseph Zbinden,
Dominique Gabriel Kolly
newest authorized signatories
Jean-Daniel Goetschi,
Hugo Joseph Zbinden,
Dominique Gabriel Kolly
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.09.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ferpicloz
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.540.968-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.520.447
Sector
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Favoriser la vente de véhicules utilitaires et de ses composantes. A cet effet elle prépare un concept d'organisation d'exposition, de communication et de publicité.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gefid Conseils SA | Marly | 22.12.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FDA Fiduciaire FR SA | Givisiez | 03.10.2008 | 21.12.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Expotrans Ltd
- Expotrans AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
28.07.2021 | active | 03859/2021 | |
28.07.2021 | active | 03854/2021 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Expotrans SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005635886, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Expotrans SA, à Ferpicloz, CHE-114.520.447 (FOSC du 29.10.2020, p. 0/1005010719).
Personne radiée:
Tinguely Consultants SA (CHE-113.199.785), organe de révision.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Gefid Conseils SA (CHE-107.877.335), à Marly, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005010719, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Expotrans SA, à Ferpicloz, CHE-114.520.447 (FOSC du 15.01.2020, p. 0/1004805336).
Personne radiée:
Ayer Roland, administrateur, signature collective à deux.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Goetschi Jean-Daniel, administrateur, secrétaire, signature collective à deux, désormais administrateur, directeur, signature collective à deux;
Tinguely Consultants SA (CH-217-3536402-6), organe de révision, maintenant à Givisiez avec le n° IDE (CHE-113.199.785).
Publication number: HR02-1004805336, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Expotrans SA, à Ferpicloz, CHE-114.520.447 (FOSC du 12.09.2014, p. 0/1711877).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Vozza Lorenzo, nom précis Vozza Lorenzo Antonio, administrateur, sans signature, maintenant à Lausanne.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.