Reports for EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA
- EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA is active in the industry «Agriculture (comestibles)» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Begnins.
- The management of the company EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA, which was founded on the 11.04.1989, consists of one person.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 31.08.2021.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.713.067.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: Aviation services S.A., César Paysagiste Sàrl, Dora Loureiro Leonel Ribeiro Transports.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Begnins
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.108.420-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.713.067
Sector
Agriculture (comestibles)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Création et exploitation d'un domaine agricole.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Michel Favre SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 03.07.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Exploitation agricole du Grangier S.A.
- Exploitation agricole du Grangier SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005281175, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA, à Begnins, CHE-108.713.067 (FOSC du 25.08.2021, p. 0/1005277539). Zosso Mange Elisabeth, qui n'est plus présidente, reste administratrice.
Publication number: HR02-1005277539, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA, à Begnins, CHE-108.713.067 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Zosso Maria n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005274954, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EXPLOITATION AGRICOLE DU GRANGIER SA, à Begnins, CHE-108.713.067 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Zosso Mange Elisabeth est maintenant de Tafers.