Reports for EMCT Immobilien SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EMCT Immobilien SA
- EMCT Immobilien SA from Urtenen-Schönbühl operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- EMCT Immobilien SA has 5 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 10.03.2017.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-105.248.335.
Management (5)
newest board members
Christoph Virgil Müller,
Robert Müller,
Anton Müller,
Patric Philipp Müller,
Ralph Cyrill Müller
newest authorized signatories
Christoph Virgil Müller,
Robert Müller,
Anton Müller,
Patric Philipp Müller,
Ralph Cyrill Müller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.10.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Urtenen-Schönbühl
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.011.717-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.248.335
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung, Nutzung und Bewirtschaftung von Grundeigentum sowie von dinglichen und obligatorischen Rechten an Grundeigentum. Erwerb, Verwaltung, Führung und Bewirtschaftung oder Beratung bei der Bewirtschaftung von Landwirtschafts-, Handels-, Industrie-, Fabrikations- oder Gewerbebetrieben oder anderen nach kaufmännischen Grundsätzen geführten Betrieben. Planung, Erstellung, Vermietung oder Verpachtung von unter Absatz 2 erwähnten Betrieben oder solchen Betrieben dienenden Anlagen, Bauten oder Einrichtungen. Überbauen von Grundstücken, Tauschen und Veräussern von Grundeigentum sowie von dinglichen und obligatorischen Rechten an Grundeigentum. Ein allfälliger Nebenzweck ist aus den Statuten ersichtlich.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
EINSPLUS Treuhand GmbH | Bern | 06.05.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr.Meyer Treuhand AG | Bern | <2004 | 05.05.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: EMCT Immobilien SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3395791, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
EMCT Immobilien SA, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, CHE-105.248.335, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 06.05.2015, Publ. 2137265).
Domizil neu:
Grubenstrasse 7, 3322 Urtenen-Schönbühl [Anpassung von Amtes wegen].
Publication number: 2137265, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
EMCT Immobilien SA, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, CHE-105.248.335, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 234 vom 01.12.2011, Publ. 6439738).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Altra Treuhand AG, in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
EINSPLUS Treuhand GmbH (CHE-423.009.474), in Liebefeld (Köniz), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6439738, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
EMCT Immobilien SA, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, CH-053.3.011.717-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 29.12.2000, S. 8921).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Christoph Virgil, von Boswil, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zielebach];
Müller, Patric Philipp, von Boswil, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher:Müller, Patric Phillipp, in Fraubrunnen];
Müller, Ralph Cyrill, von Boswil, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Jegenstorf].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.