Reports for Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen
- Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen is currently active and the industry «Other construction». The legal headquarters are in Würenlingen.
- The management of the company Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 25.05.2001.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 04.06.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AG is CHE-109.058.437.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.05.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Würenlingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.022.461-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.058.437
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Projektierung und Ausführung von Starkstrom-, Schwachstrom-, Telekommunikations-, EDV- und Steuerungsanlagen, Verkauf von elektrischen Apparaten, Beleuchtungskörpern und Haushaltartikeln; die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Baden | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006047655, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen, in Würenlingen, CHE-109.058.437, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 12.05.2023, Publ. 1005745265).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier-Frei, Alfons, von Würenlingen, in Würenlingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eglin, Oliver, von Känerkinden und Baden, in Ennetbaden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Känerkinden und Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005745265, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen, in Würenlingen, CHE-109.058.437, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 28.12.2011, S.0, Publ. 6482150).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scherrer, Markus, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Würenlingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nef, Marco, von Gais, in Eiken, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6482150, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elektro Meier AG Würenlingen, in Würenlingen, CH-400.3.022.461-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 10.05.2010, S. 2, Publ. 5624802).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eglin, Werner, von Känerkinden, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Eglin, Oliver, von Känerkinden und Baden, in Ennetbaden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Scherrer, Markus, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Würenlingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.