Reports for Elba II Swiss GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elba II Swiss GmbH
- Elba II Swiss GmbH with its legal headquarters in Opfikon is active. Elba II Swiss GmbH operates in the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses».
- Elba II Swiss GmbH has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 27.02.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-113.698.781.
Management (4)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Christmann,
Heinz Büchel,
Patrick Marie Pierre Bonnaure
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.06.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.035.768-1
UID/VAT
CHE-113.698.781
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Planung, Projektierung, Bau und Betrieb von Hotels nebst den dazugehörigen Nebenbetrieben wie Kongressräumlichkeiten, Restaurants, Cafeterias, Parkplätzen und dergleichen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und treuhänderischen Geschäfte tätigen, die mittel- oder unmittelbar mit ihrem Zweck zusammenhängen. Sie kann Grundbesitz und Beteiligungen aller Art erwerben, halten und veräussern und in der Schweiz und im Ausland Zweigniederlassungen sowie Tochtergesellschaften errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann Dritten, einschliesslich ihrer direkten oder indirekten Muttergesellschaft sowie deren direkten oder indirekten Tochtergesellschaften Darlehen oder andere Finanzierungen gewähren und für Verbindlichkeiten von solchen anderen Gesellschaften Sicherheiten aller Art stellen, einschliesslich mittels Pfandrechten an oder fiduziarischen Übereignungen von Aktiven der Gesellschaft oder Garantien jedwelcher Art, ob gegen Entgelt oder nicht.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 08.11.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Elba II Swiss S.à r.l.
- Elba II Swiss LLC
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elba II Swiss GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005687643, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Elba II Swiss GmbH, in Opfikon, CHE-113.698.781, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2022, Publ. 1005453739).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Serret, Priya Devi, mauritische Staatsangehörige, in Genève, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christmann, Thomas, von Zug, in Walchwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005453739, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Elba II Swiss GmbH, in Opfikon, CHE-113.698.781, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 24 vom 03.02.2022, Publ. 1005396008).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Incognito, Giorgio, von Cartigny, in Chêne-Bourg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005396008, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Elba II Swiss GmbH, in Opfikon, CHE-113.698.781, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2019, Publ. 1004782240).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Izmaylov, Pavel, von Genève, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Incognito, Giorgio, von Cartigny, in Chêne-Bourg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.