Reports for Ebénisterie M. Bovet S.A., succession O. Longchamp
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ebénisterie M. Bovet S.A., succession O. Longchamp
- Ebénisterie M. Bovet S.A., succession O. Longchamp has its legal headquarters in Marly and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Furniture manufacturing».
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 18.12.2012.
- Ebénisterie M. Bovet S.A., succession O. Longchamp is registered in the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-107.762.778.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.03.1974
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Marly
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.133.095-9
UID/VAT
CHE-107.762.778
Sector
Furniture manufacturing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une ébénisterie d'art.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidexpert SA Fribourg, Granges-Paccot | Granges-Paccot | <2004 | 17.12.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ebénisterie d'art Michel Bovet S.A.
- Ebénisterie d'art Michel Bovet SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ebénisterie M. Bovet S.A., succession O. Longchamp
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6980232, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Ebénisterie d'art Michel Bovet S.A., à Marly, CH-217-0133095-9, exploitation d'une ébénisterie d'art. (FOSC du 11.03.2011, p. 0/6072508).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Ebénisterie M. Bovet S.A., succession O. Longchamp.
Communication aux actionnaires:
lettre recommandée. Statuts modifiés le 10.12.2012. Bovet Michel et Aubry Jean-Baptiste ne sont plus administrateurs, leur signature est radiée. Longchamp Olivier, qui se nomme précisément Longchamp Olivier Julien n'est plus président, mais reste administrateur, avec signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 10.12.2012, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint. fidusar sa (CH-217-0150199-3) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: 6072508, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Ebénisterie d'art Michel Bovet S.A., à Marly, CH-217-0133095-9, exploitation d'une ébénisterie d'art. (FOSC du 25.08.2009, p. 10). La procuration individuelle de Aubry Laurence est radiée. Longchamp Olivier, administrateur inscrit, est nommé président, avec signature individuelle, Aubry Jean-Baptiste n'est plus président mais reste administrateur avec signature collective à deux. fidusar sa (CH-217-0150199-3), organe de révision inscrit, est maintenant domicilié à Marly. Bovet Michel, d'Auboranges, à Marly, est nommé secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 5213488, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Ebénisterie d'art Michel Bovet S.A., à Marly, CH-217-0133095-9, exploitation d'une ébénisterie d'art. (FOSC du 12.09.2008, p. 6). La procuration collective à deux de Bovet-Noth Marie-José est radiée. Procuration individuelle a été conférée à Aubry Laurence, de La Magne, à Marly.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.