Reports for EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges
- EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges from Morges operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions» and is active.
- The company was founded on 28.12.2005 and has 2 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 19.12.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges is the following: CHE-112.700.978.
- There are 16 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Eaton (Switzerland) Holding I GmbH, Eaton (Switzerland) Holding II GmbH, Eaton (Switzerland) Holding III GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.12.2005
Legal form
Branch with head office abroad
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.044.750-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.700.978
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition de participations; gestion et activité de financement pour des sociétés affiliées; services y relatifs.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- EATON LP, Glasgow, Morges branch
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005914632, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges, à Morges, CHE-112.700.978 (FOSC du 31.05.2022, p. 0/1005485535). Shah-Deo Natasha Maria n'est plus gérante;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouveau gérant:
Gevers Tom, de Belgique, à Echichens, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005485535, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges, à Morges, CHE-112.700.978 (FOSC du 09.08.2019, p. 0/1004693370). de Wit Jeremy Alexander et Delsaut Philippe Patrick André ne sont plus gérants;
leur signature est radiée. Yule Ian Bryce est maintenant à Denens.
Nouvelle gérante:
Shah-Deo Natasha Maria, du Royaume-Uni, à Morges, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004693370, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EATON LP, Glasgow, succursale de Morges, à Morges, CHE-112.700.978 (FOSC du 31.08.2018, p. 0/4446819).
Siège principal:
Glasgow (Royaume-Uni). Ophèle Olivier n'est plus gérant;
sa signature est radiée. Signature collective à deux est conférée à de Wit Jeremy Alexander, des Pays-Bas, à Mont-sur-Rolle, gérant. Les informations relatives aux associés du siège principal ne disposant pas d'un droit de signature pour la succursale sont radiées conformément à l'art. 114, al. 1, let. f ORC.
Sont concernés:
Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH, EIC HOLDING GP II et Eaton Manufacturing GmbH.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.