Reports for Dr. Bernasconi AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dr. Bernasconi AG
- Dr. Bernasconi AG has its legal headquarters in Sargans, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company Dr. Bernasconi AG consists of 3 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 05.10.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Dr. Bernasconi AG is registered in the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-114.332.940.
- Companies with an identical address: Belicontrol GmbH, LIPartner AG, Uli Lippuner AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Bibin Chakkalamattath,
Kaspar Papritz,
Dr. Thomas Josef Eisenlohr
newest authorized signatories
Bibin Chakkalamattath,
Kaspar Papritz,
Dr. Thomas Josef Eisenlohr
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.06.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sargans
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.063.381-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.332.940
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Geologie, Geotechnik, Hydrogeologie, Geothermie, Geoinformatik und Umwelt. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erweerben, verwalten, veräussern, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Zweigniederlassungen eröffnen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gähwiler, Ruckstuhl Treuhand AG | Zürich | 27.12.2021 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dr. Bernasconi AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005853485, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Dr. Bernasconi AG, in Sargans, CHE-114.332.940, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 27.12.2021, Publ. 1005368776).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Labhart, Walter, von Steckborn, in Russikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chakkalamattath, Bibin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005368776, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Dr. Bernasconi AG, in Sargans, CHE-114.332.940, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 02.12.2019, Publ. 1004772496). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 30.05.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gähwiler, Ruckstuhl Treuhand AG (CHE-107.907.864), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004772496, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Dr. Bernasconi AG, in Sargans, CHE-114.332.940, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2017, S.0, Publ. 3910635).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernasconi, Dr. Riccardo, von Lugano, in Sargans, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Papritz, Kaspar, von Schwarzenburg, in Sargans, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelprokura].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.