Reports for Dine & Drink GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dine & Drink GmbH
- Dine & Drink GmbH with its legal headquarters in Roggwil TG is a Limited liability company from the sector «Operation of restaurants». Dine & Drink GmbH is active.
- The company was founded on 04.01.2000.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 04.07.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register TG under the UID CHE-102.960.609.
- In the IPI there are 2 trademarks or applications registered by the company Dine & Drink GmbH.
Management (5)
newest authorized signatories
Eleonora Gazic,
Mirco Held,
Yves Bamberger,
Enrico Himmelberger
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.01.2000
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Roggwil (TG)
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.047.415-7
UID/VAT
CHE-102.960.609
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führen und Betreiben von Gaststätten, Restaurants und Hotels sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Gastronomie. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Consultive Revisions AG | Gossau (SG) | 05.12.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Roth Consulting und Immobilien AG | Gottlieben | 22.05.2009 | 04.12.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Tres - Mexican Bar und Restaurant | 23.03.2011 | active | 62278/2010 |
Tres Chicos | 26.01.2011 | deleted | 62277/2010 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Dine & Drink GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006076048, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Dine & Drink GmbH, in Roggwil (TG), CHE-102.960.609, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2023, Publ. 1005837270).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bissegger, Manuel, von Bussnang, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, aber nicht mit Yves Bamberger.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gazic, Eleonora, von Bergün Filisur, in St. Gallen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, aber nicht mit Yves Bamberger.
Publication number: HR02-1005837270, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Dine & Drink GmbH, in Roggwil (TG), CHE-102.960.609, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2023, Publ. 1005798212).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bamberger, Yves, von Siglistorf, in Emmen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, aber nicht mit Manuel Bissegger;
Bissegger, Manuel, von Bussnang, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, aber nicht mit Yves Bamberger;
Held, Mirco, von Rüegsau, in Andelfingen, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1005798212, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Dine & Drink GmbH, in Roggwil (TG), CHE-102.960.609, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2022, Publ. 1005519947).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wagner, Hans-Ulrich, von Bauma, in Pfäffikon ZH (Pfäffikon), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.