Reports for Demmelhuber Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Demmelhuber Immobilien AG
- Demmelhuber Immobilien AG with its legal headquarters in Büron is active. Demmelhuber Immobilien AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 17.05.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-106.247.278.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Baierl & Demmelhuber Innenausbau Swiss AG, Metalit AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Carlo Rudolf Dirschedl,
Martin Zimmermann,
Christian Demmelhuber
newest authorized signatories
Carlo Rudolf Dirschedl,
Martin Zimmermann,
Christian Demmelhuber
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Büron
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.017.262-4
UID/VAT
CHE-106.247.278
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten, Vermietung und Verwaltung von Immobilien; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum und Immaterialgüterrechten; Vornahme von Finanzierungen sowie Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wirz Treuhand AG, Schöftland | Schöftland | <2004 | 01.07.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Metalit Immobilien AG
- Metalit Metallbauelemente AG
- Metalit Metallbauelemente AG.
- Stäuble Rudolf Blechverarbeitungs AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Demmelhuber Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005182514, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Demmelhuber Immobilien AG, in Büron, CHE-106.247.278, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 08.03.2021, Publ. 1005117567).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Leibenger, Otto Martin Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Eggenfelden (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dirschedl, Carlo Rudolf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pleiskirchen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005117567, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Metalit Immobilien AG, in Büron, CHE-106.247.278, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2019, Publ. 1004664778).
Statutenänderung:
26.02.2021.
Firma neu:
Demmelhuber Immobilien AG.
Publication number: HR02-1004664778, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Metalit Metallbauelemente AG, in Büron, CHE-106.247.278, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 08.04.2019, Publ. 1004605259).
Statutenänderung:
12.06.2019.
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Gesellschaft überträgt gemäss Vertrag vom 12.06.2019 Aktiven von CHF 2'453'045.50 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 2'056'644.70 auf die Metalit AG, in Büron (CHE-337.212.644).
Gegenleistung:
CHF 396'400.80.
Firma neu:
Metalit Immobilien AG.
Zweck neu:
Halten, Vermietung und Verwaltung von Immobilien;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum und Immaterialgüterrechten;
Vornahme von Finanzierungen sowie Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen durch Brief oder E-Mail. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 12.06.2019 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kappeler, Kurt, von Beromünster, in Beromünster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bonta, Giuseppe, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Illingen (DE), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Meier, Peter, von Beromünster, in Luzern, Vizedirektor, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wirz Treuhand AG, Schöftland (CHE-106.260.451), in Schöftland, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zimmermann, Martin, von Ruswil, in Neuenkirch, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.