Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Kapital in EUR
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Genk, Belgien, Zweigniederlassung Zug
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.02.2001
Deletion from the commercial register
08.12.2009
Legal form
Branch with head office abroad
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.9.000.736-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.069.405
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten und Übertragung von Beteiligungen und Wertpapieren, Tätigkeit als Konzernfinanzgesellschaft, Kreditaufnahme und -vergabe sowie Durchführung aller damit verbundenen Finanzierungs- und Beratungsdienstleistungen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Brüssel, Belgien, Zweigniederlassung Zug
- Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Brüssel, Zweigniederlassung Zug
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Genk, Belgien, Zweigniederlassung Zug
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5380868, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Genk, Belgien, Zweigniederlassung Zug, in Zug, CH-170.9.000.736-2, Ausländische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 25.02.2009, S. 22, Publ. 4898064).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Genk (Belgien). Infolge Aufhebung dieser Zweigniederlassung wird der auf sie bezügliche Eintrag im Handelsregister gelöscht.
Publication number: 4898064, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Brüssel, Belgien, Zweigniederlassung Zug, in Zug, CH-170.9.000.736-2, Ausländische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2007, S. 16, Publ. 4160000).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Brüssel (Belgien).
Firma neu:
Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Genk, Belgien, Zweigniederlassung Zug.
Hauptsitz neu:
Genk (Belgien) [bisher: Hauptsitz: Brüssel (Belgien)].
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Der Zweck des Hauptsitzes wird gelöscht].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
Infolge einer Änderung der Rechtsgrundlagen wird der Eintrag an die Vorgaben von Art. 114 HRegV angepasst.
Zweck:
Erwerb, Halten und Übertragung von Beteiligungen und Wertpapieren, Tätigkeit als Konzernfinanzgesellschaft, Kreditaufnahme und -vergabe sowie Durchführung aller damit verbundenen Finanzierungs- und Beratungsdienstleistungen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eibeck, Manfred, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in St. Margarethen (AT), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Van Leemput, Eddy, belgischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zandhoven (NL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4160000, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Decoma Automotive Holding N.V., Brüssel, Belgien, Zweigniederlassung Zug, in Zug, CH-170.9.000.736-2, Erwerb, Ausländische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2007, S. 21, Publ. 3787278).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Brüssel (Belgien).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Martel, Pierre, kanadischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luxemburg (LU), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Van Leemput, Eddy, belgischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zandhoven (NL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.