Reports for DAS Labor AG in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DAS Labor AG in Liquidation
- DAS Labor AG in Liquidation has its legal headquarters in Wolfhalden and is in liquidation. It operates in the sector «Services regarding public relations».
- The management of the company DAS Labor AG in Liquidation, which was founded on the 11.12.2013, consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 22.11.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- DAS Labor AG in Liquidation is registered in the Canton of AR under the UID CHE-258.858.975.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wolfhalden
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-300.3.017.987-7
UID/VAT
CHE-258.858.975
Sector
Services regarding public relations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Marketing, Kommunikation, Strategie, Werbung, Public Relations, Unternehmensberatung, Coaching - Unternehmen und Einzelpersonen. Weiters bezweckt sie den Import und Export, sowie den Handel mit Produkten. Alle erwähnten Tätigkeiten können auch auf Rechnung Dritter ausgeführt werden. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- DAS Labor AG
- DS Labor AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DAS Labor AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS01-0000045663, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh.
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Aktiengesellschaft Publikationsdatum: SHAB 22.11.2023 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 22.11.2028 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Vorderland Treuhand AG, Poststrasse 27, 9410 Heiden Im Auftrag von: DAS Labor AG in Liquidation Vorderdorfstrasse 693
René Rudolf Sonderegger Vorderdorfstrasse 693
Publication number: HR02-1005888849, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
DAS Labor AG, in Wolfhalden, CHE-258.858.975, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 21.04.2021, Publ. 1005155184).
Firma neu:
DAS Labor AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 15.11.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sonderegger, René, von Heiden, in Wolfhalden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sonderegger, Denise, von Heiden, in Wolfhalden, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates];
Sonderegger, René Rudolf, von Heiden, in Wolfhalden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.