Reports for DAMOVO Schweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DAMOVO Schweiz AG
- DAMOVO Schweiz AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Glattbrugg. DAMOVO Schweiz AG belongs to the industry «Trading in IT and communications products» and is currently active.
- The management of the company DAMOVO Schweiz AG consists of 3 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.03.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-105.558.190.
- A&O Elektro AG, Baggenstos AG, benefitIMPACT AG have the same address as DAMOVO Schweiz AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.06.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.023.295-0
UID/VAT
CHE-105.558.190
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen sowie Einkauf und Vertrieb von Hard- und Software auf dem Gebiet der drahtgebundenen und mobilen Tele- und Datenkommunikation; kann Lizenzrechte oder Patente erwerben, verwerten oder damit Handel treiben, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben, auf eigene Rechnung oder treuhänderisch Finanzgeschäfte aller Art eingehen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rovisa Wirtschaftsprüfungs AG | Dietikon | 14.04.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 03.02.2009 | 13.04.2020 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 02.02.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- DAMOVO Switzerland Ltd
- DAMOVO Suisse SA
- Ericsson Business Networks AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DAMOVO Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005996498, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
DAMOVO Schweiz AG, in Opfikon, CHE-105.558.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2021, Publ. 1005318801).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sänger, Karl-Heinz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Egmating (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kramer, Thilo, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Essen (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005318801, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
DAMOVO Schweiz AG, in Opfikon, CHE-105.558.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 24 vom 04.02.2021, Publ. 1005091377).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peter, Roger, von Bettwiesen, in Opfikon, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Säurich, Jörg, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Birr, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1005091377, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
DAMOVO Schweiz AG, in Opfikon, CHE-105.558.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 71 vom 14.04.2020, Publ. 1004869763).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Andjelic, Drazen, von Zürich, in Opfikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bicherl, Bernhard Karl, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Seligenstadt (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates oder einem Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.