Reports for CSM Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CSM Holding AG
- CSM Holding AG from Kaisten operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies» and is active.
- The management of the company CSM Holding AG, which was founded on the 22.02.1989, consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 27.11.2015.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-101.565.096.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.02.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kaisten
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.008.159-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.565.096
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen aller Art; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HS Revisions AG | Stein (AG) | 09.03.2005 | 24.05.2009 | |
Werthmüller Treuhand | Wölflinswil | <2004 | 08.03.2005 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CSM Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2507429, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
CSM Holding AG, in Kaisten, CHE-101.565.096, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2014, Publ. 1578735).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Winter, Marcel, von Kaisten, in Kaisten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Winter, Claudia, von Kaisten, in Kaisten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1578735, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
CSM Holding AG, in Kaisten, CHE-101.565.096, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 12.05.2011, Publ. 6158416).
Domizil neu:
Weidstrasse 36, 5082 Kaisten.
Publication number: 6158416, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Meka AG, in Kaisten, CH-400.3.008.159-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 25.05.2009, S. 2, Publ. 5033280).
Statutenänderung:
19.04.2011, 04.05.2011.
Firma neu:
CSM Holding AG.
Domizil neu:
Unterhalden 14, 5082 Kaisten.
Zweck neu:
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen aller Art;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Winter, Marcel, von Kaisten, in Kaisten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Winter, Claudia, von Kaisten, in Kaisten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Einzelprokura];
Winter, Simon, von Kaisten, in Kaisten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.