Reports for CRC-SNG SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CRC-SNG SA
- CRC-SNG SA has its legal headquarters in Bulle and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Production of metal goods».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 24.10.2023.
- The company CRC-SNG SA is registered under the UID CHE-106.412.465.
- fribulimmo SA, Proma S.A. have the same address as CRC-SNG SA.
Management (3)
newest board members
Héribert-Pierre Dousse,
Valérie Michel Dousse,
Stéphane René Uldry
newest authorized signatories
Héribert-Pierre Dousse,
Valérie Michel Dousse,
Stéphane René Uldry
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.01.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bulle
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-232.0.730.371-1
UID/VAT
CHE-106.412.465
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication et vente de toutes protections solaires et fermetures, notamment stores, volets, moustiquaires et leurs dérivés (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Multifiduciaire Fribourg SA, succursale de Bulle | Bulle | 12.02.2021 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Butty SA | Ursy | <2004 | 11.02.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CRC Volets SA
- Castella S.A.
- Castella SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CRC-SNG SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005867588, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
CRC-SNG SA, à Bulle, CHE-106.412.465 (FOSC du 01.02.2022, p. 0/1005394272).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Uldry Stéphane René, administrateur, signature collective à deux, maintenant à Morlon.
Publication number: HR02-1005394272, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
CRC-SNG SA, à Bulle, CHE-106.412.465 (FOSC du 12.02.2021, p. 0/1005099328).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Uldry Stéphane René, administrateur, signature collective à deux, maintenant à Le Pâquier FR.
Publication number: HR02-1005099328, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
CRC-SNG SA, à Bulle, CHE-106.412.465 (FOSC du 06.12.2017, p. 0/3913773).
Personne radiée:
Fiduciaire Gilbert Butty SA (CH-217-0330263-5), organe de révision.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Multifiduciaire Fribourg S.A., succursale de Bulle (CHE-174.226.822), à Bulle, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.