Reports for Conas Group GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Conas Group GmbH
- Conas Group GmbH with its legal headquarters in Olten is active. Conas Group GmbH operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company Conas Group GmbH, which was founded on the 12.11.2019, consists of one person.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 24.05.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-451.543.224.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.11.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Olten
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.069.058-3
UID/VAT
CHE-451.543.224
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beteiligung an und Finanzierung von in- und ausländischen Gesellschaften. Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Immobilienbereich sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Gastronomiebereich als auch die Herstellung sowie den Handel mit Lebensmitteln und Getränken. Zudem Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und des Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Grundstücke, Immobilien, Immaterialgüterrechte und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Conas Group Sagl
- Conas Group Sàrl
- Conas Group Ltd liab Co
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Conas Group GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006039082, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Conas Group GmbH, bisher in Bern, CHE-451.543.224, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2022, Publ. 1005613812).
Statutenänderung:
22.04.2024.
Sitz neu:
Olten.
Domizil neu:
Haldenstrasse 16, 4600 Olten. [gestrichen: Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Publication number: HR02-1006038875, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Conas Group GmbH, in Bern, CHE-451.543.224, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2022, Publ. 1005613812). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Olten im Handelsregister des Kantons Solothurn eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Bern von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005613812, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Conas Group GmbH, bisher in Zürich, CHE-451.543.224, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2019, Publ. 1004759927).
Statutenänderung:
18.11.2022.
Sitz neu:
Bern.
Domizil neu:
c/o Manuel Riess, Unterer Aareggweg 5, 3004 Bern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Broggi, Florian Alexandre, von Castel San Pietro, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Riess, Manuel Christian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Zürich, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.