Reports for ChrisPi Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ChrisPi Sàrl
- ChrisPi Sàrl with its legal headquarters in Turtmann is active. ChrisPi Sàrl operates in the sector «Operation of bars».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 08.08.2011.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 05.08.2020. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- ChrisPi Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-379.716.531.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.08.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Turtmann-Unterems
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.4.014.605-2
UID/VAT
CHE-379.716.531
Sector
Operation of bars
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb, Vermietung und Führung von öffentlichen Gaststätten wie Cafés, Bars, Salons, Restaurants oder Hotels. Kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen mit ähnlichem oder gleichem Zweck beteiligen, solche erwerben oder mit solchen Fusionieren. Kann Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ChrisPi GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ChrisPi Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004952364, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
ChrisPi Sàrl, in Turtmann-Unterems, CHE-379.716.531, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 02.10.2018, Publ. 1004467527).
Domizil neu:
Kantonsstrasse 85, 3946 Turtmann.
Publication number: HR02-1004467527, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
ChrisPi Sàrl, in Turtmann, CHE-379.716.531, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2011, Publ. 6476656).
Sitz neu:
Turtmann-Unterems.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jeanneret, Martin René, von Locle, in Yverdon-les-Bains, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sadiku, Naim, serbischer Staatsangehöriger, in Martigny, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 6476656, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
ChrisPi Sàrl, in Turtmann, CH-600.4.014.605-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6292394).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meizoz, Christian, von Riddes, in Chamoson, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Centofanti, Piero-Federico, von Nax, in Vétroz, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jeanneret, Martin René, von Locle, in Yverdon-les-Bains, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.