Reports for Chasa Fent AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Chasa Fent AG
- Chasa Fent AG has its legal headquarters in Sent and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Chasa Fent AG consists of 5 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.11.2019. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-311.059.720.
Management (5)
newest board members
René Franz Müller,
Barbara Amrein-Steiger,
Irene Susanne Grüter,
Josef Urs Grüter,
Urs Thomas Amrein
newest authorized signatories
René Franz Müller,
Barbara Amrein-Steiger,
Irene Susanne Grüter,
Josef Urs Grüter,
Urs Thomas Amrein
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Scuol
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.012.866-2
UID/VAT
CHE-311.059.720
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, Bau, Verkauf, Vermietung, Verwaltung, Bewirtschaftung und Finanzierung von Immobilien im In- und Ausland, sowie den Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Patent- und Lizenzgeschäfte. Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Übernahme und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen und Vermögenswerten jeder Art sowie deren Finanzierung, Betriebsberatungen; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Chasa Fent AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004759513, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Chasa Fent AG, in Scuol, CHE-311.059.720, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 05.04.2018, Publ. 4152287).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Brigitte, von Hildisrieden, in Hildisrieden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4152287, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Chasa Fent AG, in Scuol, CHE-311.059.720, Plaz 150, 7554 Sent, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
03.03.2018.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, Bau, Verkauf, Vermietung, Verwaltung, Bewirtschaftung und Finanzierung von Immobilien im In- und Ausland, sowie den Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Patent- und Lizenzgeschäfte. Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Übernahme und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen und Vermögenswerten jeder Art sowie deren Finanzierung, Betriebsberatungen;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 120'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 120'000.00.
Aktien:
120 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft und des Verwaltungsrates an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 03.03.2018 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Müller, René Franz, von Hildisrieden, in Hildisrieden, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Amrein, Barbara, von Büron, in Hildisrieden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Amrein, Urs Thomas, von Hildisrieden, in Hildisrieden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grüter, Irene Susanne, von Inwil, in Ruswil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grüter, Josef Urs, von Ruswil, in Ruswil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Brigitte, von Hildisrieden, in Hildisrieden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.